E | 06/12/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/12/2017 | Filed without the Governor's signature | Journal Page: 4245 | |
E | 05/23/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2881 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4565 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2568 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2880 | |
Senate | 05/21/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2249 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3788 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | RV#1358 | Journal Page: 3788 |
House | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3788 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3788 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3771 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3771 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2886 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 2294 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2294 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 478 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 478 | |
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |