6 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 5 | | relating to the salary of a bailiff in El Paso County. |
---|
8 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 7 | | SECTION 1. Sections 53.0091(a), (b), and (d), Government |
---|
10 | 8 | | Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 9 | | (a) Each bailiff appointed under Section 53.002(c) shall be |
---|
12 | 10 | | paid an annual salary out of the general fund of El Paso County, |
---|
13 | 11 | | unless another source of funding is approved by the commissioners |
---|
14 | 12 | | court. The council of judges shall set the salary in writing |
---|
15 | 13 | | consistent with pay scales adopted by the commissioners court that |
---|
16 | 14 | | are comparable to other positions within El Paso County. [The |
---|
17 | 15 | | appointing judge shall set the salary in writing, but except as |
---|
18 | 16 | | otherwise provided by this section, the annual salary shall be set |
---|
19 | 17 | | at $18,000 on August 26, 1985, and thereafter the $18,000 annual |
---|
20 | 18 | | salary shall increase as provided by Subsection (c).] |
---|
21 | 19 | | (b) Bailiffs appointed under Section 53.002(c) who held |
---|
22 | 20 | | office as bailiffs under that section [Chapter 817, Acts of the 62nd |
---|
23 | 21 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 1971 (Article 2292l, Vernon's Texas |
---|
24 | 22 | | Civil Statutes), or under Chapter 532, Acts of the 67th |
---|
25 | 23 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 1981 (Article 2292o, Vernon's Texas |
---|
26 | 24 | | Civil Statutes),] on June 30, 2017 [August 25, 1985], are entitled |
---|
27 | 25 | | to receive at least the same annual salary or compensation under |
---|
28 | 26 | | this section as they received [under those Acts] on that date |
---|
29 | 27 | | [August 26, 1985]. |
---|
30 | 28 | | (d) A person appointed to succeed a bailiff who held office |
---|
31 | 29 | | as bailiff under Section 53.002(c) [Chapter 817, Acts of the 62nd |
---|
32 | 30 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 1971 (Article 2292l, Vernon's Texas |
---|
33 | 31 | | Civil Statutes), or under Chapter 532, Acts of the 67th |
---|
34 | 32 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 1981 (Article 2292o, Vernon's Texas |
---|
35 | 33 | | Civil Statutes),] is not entitled to be paid the same annual salary |
---|
36 | 34 | | paid to the bailiff the person [he] succeeds, but is entitled to |
---|
37 | 35 | | receive an annual salary as provided by Subsection (a) [the annual |
---|
38 | 36 | | salary as provided by this section so that the bailiffs' salaries |
---|
39 | 37 | | under this section will become uniform with the passage of time. A |
---|
40 | 38 | | person appointed to succeed any bailiff before October 1, 1986, is |
---|
41 | 39 | | entitled to the $18,000 annual salary set by Subsection (a). A |
---|
42 | 40 | | person appointed to succeed any bailiff on or after October 1, 1986, |
---|
43 | 41 | | is entitled to the $18,000 annual salary set by Subsection (a) or |
---|
44 | 42 | | the salary set on the date the bailiff is appointed for a Grade 20 of |
---|
45 | 43 | | the El Paso County Job Guide Designation for a new employee under |
---|
46 | 44 | | Grade 20, whichever is greater. A bailiff whose annual salary is |
---|
47 | 45 | | set on September 30, 1986, at $18,000 under this section is on |
---|
48 | 46 | | October 1, 1986, entitled to any salary increase provided for under |
---|
49 | 47 | | Subsection (c) or the salary set on October 1, 1986, for a Grade 20 |
---|
50 | 48 | | of the El Paso County Job Guide Designation for a new employee under |
---|
51 | 49 | | Grade 20, whichever is greater. After October 1, 1986, all salary |
---|
52 | 50 | | increases for bailiffs shall be uniform as provided for in |
---|
53 | 51 | | Subsection (c). If a substantial number of those job titles or |
---|
54 | 52 | | positions listed on the effective date of this section under Grade |
---|
55 | 53 | | 20 of the El Paso County Job Guide Designation are removed from |
---|
56 | 54 | | Grade 20 or the El Paso County Job Guide Designation is replaced |
---|
57 | 55 | | with some other system for setting employees' salaries under those |
---|
58 | 56 | | job titles or positions listed under Grade 20 of the El Paso County |
---|
59 | 57 | | Job Guide Designation, on the date a new bailiff is appointed, the |
---|
60 | 58 | | starting salary being paid at that time by El Paso County to the |
---|
61 | 59 | | functional equivalent of Grade 20 of the El Paso County Job Guide |
---|
62 | 60 | | Designation shall be used in place of Grade 20. In determining the |
---|
63 | 61 | | functional equivalent of Grade 20 under this section, the job |
---|
64 | 62 | | titles, positions, or their equivalent listed under Grade 20 on |
---|
65 | 63 | | August 26, 1985, shall be considered as the only factors]. |
---|
66 | 64 | | SECTION 2. Sections 53.0091(c) and (e), Government Code, |
---|
67 | 65 | | are repealed. |
---|
68 | 66 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|