Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1248 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill March 3, 2017

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Witness List February 2, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill May 29, 2017

Conference Committee Report*

Bill February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2017
Bill April 3, 2017