Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1267 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Taylor of Galveston S.B. No. 1267
22 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2017; March 13, 2017, read
33 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 26, 2017,
44 reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0;
55 April 26, 2017, sent to printer.)
66 Click here to see the committee vote
77
88
99 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1010 AN ACT
1111 relating to school district ad valorem tax rates.
1212 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1313 SECTION 1. Section 26.08, Tax Code, is amended by adding
1414 Subsections (q) and (r) to read as follows:
1515 (q) This subsection applies only to a school district
1616 described by Subsection (n) whose adopted tax rate was approved at
1717 an election under this section in the 2006 tax year or any
1818 subsequent tax year. Notwithstanding Subsection (n), for purposes
1919 of this section, the rollback tax rate of the school district is the
2020 higher of:
2121 (1) the amount computed under Subsection (n); or
2222 (2) the sum of the following:
2323 (A) the highest maintenance and operations tax
2424 rate adopted by the district for the 2007 tax year or any subsequent
2525 tax year in which the adopted tax rate of the district was approved
2626 at an election under this section; and
2727 (B) the district's current debt rate.
2828 (r) Subsection (q) applies to a school district only if the
2929 district has adopted a tax rate equal to or higher than the rate
3030 provided by that subsection for any tax year in the preceding 10 tax
3131 years.
3232 SECTION 2. (a) The comptroller of public accounts shall
3333 conduct a study to determine:
3434 (1) the number of school districts that adopt an ad
3535 valorem tax rate for the tax year in which this Act takes effect
3636 that is lower than the district's ad valorem tax rate for the tax
3737 year preceding that tax year and then, for the tax year following
3838 the tax year in which this Act takes effect, adopt an ad valorem tax
3939 rate that is higher than the district's ad valorem tax rate for the
4040 tax year in which this Act takes effect; and
4141 (2) the number of school districts that adopted an ad
4242 valorem tax rate for the second tax year preceding the tax year in
4343 which this Act takes effect that was lower than the district's ad
4444 valorem tax rate for the tax year preceding that tax year and then,
4545 for the tax year preceding the tax year in which this Act takes
4646 effect, adopted an ad valorem tax rate that was higher than the
4747 district's ad valorem tax rate for the second tax year preceding the
4848 tax year in which this Act takes effect.
4949 (b) The comptroller of public accounts shall report the
5050 results of the study conducted under this section to each member of
5151 the legislature not later than December 1, 2019.
5252 SECTION 3. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies
5353 to the ad valorem tax rate of a school district beginning with the
5454 2017 tax year, except as provided by Subsection (b) of this section.
5555 (b) If the governing body of a school district adopted an ad
5656 valorem tax rate for the school district for the 2017 tax year
5757 before the effective date of this Act, the change in law made by
5858 this Act applies to the ad valorem tax rate of that school district
5959 beginning with the 2018 tax year, and the law in effect when the tax
6060 rate was adopted applies to the 2017 tax year with respect to that
6161 school district.
6262 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
6363 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6464 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
6565 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
6666 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
6767 * * * * *