House
|
05/21/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1321
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Recommendations filed with the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 777
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 777
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|