Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1269 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Miles, Whitmire S.B. No. 1269
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2017; March 13, 2017, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water & Rural
4- Affairs; April 6, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
5- Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0;
6- April 6, 2017, sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1269 By: Perry
1+By: Miles, Garcia, Whitmire S.B. No. 1269
92
103
114 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
125 AN ACT
136 relating to the establishment of a task force to conduct a
147 comprehensive study on flood control infrastructure for Harris and
158 Galveston Counties.
169 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1710 SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "task force" means the
1811 task force on flood control infrastructure established under this
1912 section.
2013 (b) The task force is established to conduct a comprehensive
2114 flood control infrastructure study for Harris and Galveston
2215 Counties. The study must:
2316 (1) assess the existing infrastructure in Harris and
2417 Galveston Counties with respect to flood control; and
2518 (2) identify infrastructure improvements necessary to
2619 mitigate flooding in those counties.
2720 (c) The task force is composed of 12 members as follows:
2821 (1) one person appointed by the governor;
2922 (2) one person appointed by the lieutenant governor;
3023 (3) one person appointed by the speaker of the house of
3124 representatives;
3225 (4) two representatives of the University of Houston's
3326 Hobby School of Public Affairs or Cullen College of Engineering,
3427 one of whom is appointed by the author of this Act and one of whom is
3528 appointed by the sponsor of this Act;
3629 (5) two representatives of Texas Southern University's
3730 Barbara Jordan-Mickey Leland School of Public Affairs or Department
3831 of Transportation Studies, one of whom is appointed by the author of
3932 this Act and one of whom is appointed by the sponsor of this Act;
4033 (6) one representative of the mayor of the City of
4134 Houston, appointed by the mayor;
4235 (7) one representative of the Harris County
4336 Commissioners Court, appointed by the commissioners court;
4437 (8) one representative of the Galveston County
4538 Commissioners Court, appointed by the commissioners court;
4639 (9) one other person appointed by the author of this
4740 Act; and
4841 (10) one other person appointed by the sponsor of this
4942 Act.
5043 (d) One member appointed under Subsection (c)(4) of this
5144 section serves as the presiding officer of the task force, and one
5245 member appointed under Subsection (c)(5) of this section serves as
5346 the assistant presiding officer.
5447 (e) The Hobby School of Public Affairs and the Cullen
5548 College of Engineering of the University of Houston shall provide
5649 necessary staff and administrative support to the task force.
5750 (f) The Harris County Flood Control District shall serve as
5851 an advisor to the task force by reviewing task force work products
5952 and providing data and other information necessary to conduct the
6053 study.
6154 (g) The task force shall prepare a report that includes:
6255 (1) a description of the activities of the task force;
6356 (2) the findings and recommendations of the task
6457 force, including any proposed policy recommendations; and
6558 (3) any proposals for legislation or other matters the
6659 task force considers appropriate.
6760 (h) Not later than December 1, 2018, the task force shall
6861 submit the report prepared under this section to:
6962 (1) the governor;
7063 (2) the lieutenant governor;
7164 (3) the speaker of the house of representatives; and
7265 (4) the presiding officers of the standing committees
7366 of the senate and house of representatives having primary
7467 jurisdiction over issues relating to flood control infrastructure.
7568 (i) The task force is abolished and this Act expires January
7669 1, 2019.
7770 SECTION 2. This Act does not make an appropriation. A
7871 provision of this Act that imposes a new duty on a governmental
7972 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
8073 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
8174 provision.
8275 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
8376 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
8477 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
8578 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
8679 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
87- * * * * *