E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4150
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 3804
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3805
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3805
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 918
|
Journal Page: 3805
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5590
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5589
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 2552
|
Journal Page: 5587
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3884
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3884
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3744
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3744
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3744
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2068
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2068
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2068
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2068
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1921
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3433
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1245
|
Journal Page: 3432
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3432
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3431
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1184
|
Journal Page: 3301
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3301
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
2-Larson
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Workman
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 8, Section 14
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3295
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/11/17 1:23 PM
|
Journal Page: 3285
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 8, Section 14
|
Journal Page: 3285
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3285
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 2780
|
Journal Page: 3285
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3391
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1604
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1604
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1604
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Amended
|
FA2 Perry
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Motion to table fails
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Perry
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1534
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1532
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 483
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 483
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|