E | 05/29/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/29/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4243 | |
E | 05/23/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2881 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4566 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2568 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2880 | |
Senate | 05/21/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2249 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | RV#1358 | Journal Page: 3788 |
House | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3788 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3788 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3771 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3771 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3238 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1975 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1321 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1273 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1273 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1273 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1272 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1272 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1272 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1272 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1141 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 483 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 483 | |
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |