Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1290 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2017

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 1290
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2017; March 13, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 20, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access to criminal history record information by an
 emergency communication district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.1297 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.1297.  ACCESS TO CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD
 INFORMATION:  EMPLOYMENT BY EMERGENCY COMMUNICATION DISTRICT.
 (a)  An emergency communication district created under Chapter
 772, Health and Safety Code, is entitled to obtain from the
 department criminal history record information maintained by the
 department that relates to a person who is:
 (1)  an applicant for employment by or an employee of
 the district;
 (2)  an applicant for a volunteer position or a
 volunteer with the district; or
 (3)  an applicant for employment by or an employee of a
 person that contracts with the district.
 (b)  Criminal history record information obtained by an
 emergency communication district under Subsection (a) may not be
 released or disclosed to any person except:
 (1)  in a criminal proceeding;
 (2)  on court order; or
 (3)  with the consent of the person who is the subject
 of the criminal history record information.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *