LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1298
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1298
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1298
Compare Versions
SB1298 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1298 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1298 Enrolled May 27, 2017
SB1298 Comm Sub May 14, 2017
SB1298 Engrossed April 26, 2017
SB1298 Comm Sub April 18, 2017
SB1298 Introduced March 3, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB1298 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1298 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1298 Enrolled May 27, 2017
SB1298 Comm Sub May 14, 2017
SB1298 Engrossed April 26, 2017
SB1298 Comm Sub April 18, 2017
SB1298 Introduced March 3, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare