E | 05/28/2017 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | December 31, 2017 | |
E | 05/28/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4213 | |
E | 05/19/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2226 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3885 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2119 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2226 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2077 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Record vote | RV#1301 | Journal Page: 3622 |
House | 05/17/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3622 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3622 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3573 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3573 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1842 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 1473 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1473 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Kolkhorst | Journal Page: 882 |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 520 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 520 | |
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |