Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1317 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2017

                    By: Uresti S.B. No. 1317
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2017; March 14, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 24, 2017,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 3; April 24, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1317 By:  Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the earliest day a public school teacher may be required
 to report for service.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.010 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.010.  FIRST DAY OF TEACHER SERVICE. (a)  Except as
 provided by Subsection (b), a school district may not require a
 teacher to report for service at the beginning of a school year
 earlier than the seventh business day before the first day that
 instruction will be provided to students.
 (b)  A school district may require a teacher who is in the
 teacher's first year of employment with the district to report for
 service at the beginning of a school year up to 10 business days
 before the first day that instruction will be provided to students.
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.010, Education Code, as added by this
 Act, applies beginning with the 2018-2019 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *