E
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4150
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5682
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3783
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3783
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3783
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3762
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2494
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1564
|
Journal Page: 4207
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4207
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4207
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4121
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Price
|
Journal Page: 4120
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4120
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 3022
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 3022
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1841
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1287
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Zaffirini
|
Journal Page: 1252
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1252
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1251
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1146
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 522
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 522
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|