House | 05/23/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4366 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3022 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1732 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1655 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1655 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1655 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1655 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1654 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1654 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Perry | Journal Page: 1654 |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1654 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1654 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1653 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1286 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1260 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 523 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 523 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |