Senate | 04/19/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1176 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1143 | |
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 547 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 524 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 524 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |