House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 3150 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3150 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2297 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1638 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1540 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1540 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1540 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1539 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1539 | |
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1539 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |