Senate | 05/18/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1532 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1321 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 539 | |
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 539 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |