Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1376 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Buckingham S.B. No. 1376
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2017; March 16, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 10, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 10, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1376 By:  Buckingham


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a joint interim study regarding the state's response to
 modifications to federal health care laws.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  CREATION OF JOINT INTERIM COMMITTEE.  (a)  A
 joint interim committee is created to study the ability in this
 state to effectively respond and adapt to and implement significant
 modifications to federal health care laws, regulations, and
 requirements.
 (b)  The joint interim committee is composed of:
 (1)  six members of the senate appointed by the
 lieutenant governor; and
 (2)  six members of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives.
 (c)  The lieutenant governor and speaker of the house of
 representatives shall each designate a co-chair from among the
 joint interim committee members.
 (d)  The joint interim committee shall convene at the joint
 call of the co-chairs.
 (e)  The joint interim committee may adopt rules necessary to
 carry out the committee's duties under this section.
 (f)  The joint interim committee has all other powers and
 duties provided to a special or select committee by the rules of the
 senate and house of representatives, by Subchapter B, Chapter 301,
 Government Code, and by policies of the senate and house committees
 on administration.
 SECTION 2.  INTERIM STUDY RELATING TO THE STATE'S ABILITY TO
 RESPOND TO MODIFICATION OF FEDERAL HEALTH CARE LAWS. (a)  The
 joint interim committee shall study the ability in this state to
 respond and adapt to and implement significant modifications to
 federal health care laws, regulations, and requirements.
 (b)  The committee shall collaborate with the Health and
 Human Services Commission, the Texas Department of Insurance, and
 other appropriate agencies to conduct a comprehensive, data-driven
 readiness review to:
 (1)  analyze the potential impact of modifications to
 federal health care laws, regulations, and requirements on:
 (A)  state, county, and local governments and
 other public entities; and
 (B)  health care providers, hospitals, health
 benefit plans, and other private organizations and individuals in
 this state;
 (2)  identify changes to state laws, regulations, and
 requirements necessary to access or manage federal funding:
 (A)  from:
 (i)  Medicaid;
 (ii)  Medicare; or
 (iii)  a block grant funding system
 established by the federal government; or
 (B)  authorized by a waiver issued under Section
 1115 of the federal Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1315);
 (3)  identify legislative reforms and executive
 rulemaking necessary to comply with modified federal health care
 laws, regulations, and requirements; and
 (4)  review and assess the potential impact of proposed
 federal and state policies and reforms on:
 (A)  overall affordability of health care
 services;
 (B)  health care cost containment goals;
 (C)  patient access to physical, behavioral, and
 mental health care, especially in rural or underserved areas;
 (D)  health care delivery systems in this state;
 (E)  patient outcomes;
 (F)  reimbursement rates to health care
 providers; and
 (G)  workforce shortages.
 (c)  The joint interim committee shall prepare a report
 reflecting the study required under Subsection (a) of this section
 that includes proposed reforms to improve the ability in this state
 to respond and adapt to and implement significant modifications to
 federal health care laws, regulations, and requirements. The joint
 interim committee shall include in the report recommendations of
 specific statutory and regulatory changes that appear necessary
 from the committee's study.
 SECTION 3.  COMMITTEE FINDINGS AND PROPOSED REFORMS.
 (a)  Not later than December 1, 2018, the joint interim committee
 created under Section 1 of this Act shall submit to the lieutenant
 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the
 governor the report prepared under Section 2 of this Act.
 (b)  Not later than the 60th day after the effective date of
 this Act, the lieutenant governor and speaker of the house of
 representatives shall appoint the members of the joint interim
 committee in accordance with Section 1 of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  ABOLITION OF COMMITTEE. The joint interim
 committee created under Section 1 of this Act is abolished and this
 Act expires January 20, 2019.
 SECTION 5.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *