House | 05/08/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3025 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Recommitted to committee | Journal Page: 2453 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2125 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 895 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 631 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 110 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 110 | |
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |