Senate | 05/09/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 540 | |
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 540 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |