E | 06/12/2017 | Effective on 1/1/18 | ||
E | 06/12/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4245 | |
E | 05/28/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4213 | |
House | 05/28/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6033 | |
Senate | 05/27/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3794 | |
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4076 | |
House | 05/26/2017 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 5568 | |
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Read | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/26/2017 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3545 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 2494 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4193 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Record vote | RV#1545 | Journal Page: 4192 |
House | 05/22/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 4192 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4192 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4101 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4101 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3606 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1474 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 966 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 966 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 966 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Perry | Journal Page: 966 |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 966 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 966 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 966 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 860 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 540 | |
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 540 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |