E | 06/01/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/01/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4244 | |
E | 05/27/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4076 | |
House | 05/27/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5680 | |
Senate | 05/27/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3786 | |
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4076 | |
Senate | 05/25/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3153 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Record vote | RV#1814 | Journal Page: 4809 |
House | 05/24/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 4809 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4809 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4792 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4792 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3606 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3234 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1977 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1145 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 541 | |
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 541 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |