House | 05/16/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3606 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 3019 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3019 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1801 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1261 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1214 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1214 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1214 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1214 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1214 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1214 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1214 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1145 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 541 | |
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 541 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |