E | 05/18/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/18/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2113 | |
E | 05/08/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1732 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3022 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1722 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1732 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1676 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2520 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2518 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | RV#735 | Journal Page: 2520 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2520 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2520 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2471 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2471 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2692 | Journal Page: 2471 |
House | 05/02/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2299 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 1573 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1573 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1447 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hinojosa | Journal Page: 941 |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 940 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 860 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 541 | |
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 541 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |