E
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4084
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3148
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1814
|
Journal Page: 4809
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4809
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4809
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4792
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Amended
|
1-S. Thompson
|
Journal Page: 4792
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4792
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3452
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2510
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1354
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1321
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 542
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 542
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|