Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1415 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hughes S.B. No. 1415
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2017; March 16, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 May 4, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 4, 2017, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1415 By:  Taylor of Collin


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the child protective service functions of the
 Department of Family and Protective Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 155.201, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  On receiving notice that a court exercising
 jurisdiction under Chapter 262 has ordered the transfer of a suit
 under Section 262.203(a)(2), the court of continuing, exclusive
 jurisdiction shall, pursuant to the requirements of Section
 155.204(i), transfer the proceedings to the court in which the suit
 under Chapter 262 is pending.
 SECTION 2.  Section 155.204(i), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (i)  If a transfer order has been signed by a court
 exercising jurisdiction under Chapter 262, the Department of Family
 and Protective Services shall [a party may] file the transfer order
 with the clerk of the court of continuing, exclusive jurisdiction.
 On receipt and without a hearing or further order from the court of
 continuing, exclusive jurisdiction, the clerk of the court of
 continuing, exclusive jurisdiction shall transfer the files as
 provided by this subchapter.
 SECTION 3.  Section 161.206, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  In a suit filed by the Department of Family and
 Protective Services seeking termination of the parent-child
 relationship for both parents of the child, the court may order
 termination of the parent-child relationship for a parent only if
 the court finds by clear and convincing evidence grounds for the
 termination of the parent-child relationship for that parent. An
 order rendered under this subsection must state the grounds for
 terminating the parent-child relationship for that parent.
 SECTION 4.  Section 262.201, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-5) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Unless the child has already been returned to the
 parent, managing conservator, possessory conservator, guardian,
 caretaker, or custodian entitled to possession and the temporary
 order, if any, has been dissolved, a full adversary hearing shall be
 held not later than the 14th day after the date the child was taken
 into possession by the governmental entity, unless the court grants
 an extension under Subsection (a-3) or (a-5).
 (a-5)  If a parent who is not indigent appears in opposition
 to the suit, the court may, for good cause shown, postpone the full
 adversary hearing for not more than seven days from the date of the
 parent's appearance to allow the parent to hire an attorney or to
 provide the parent's attorney time to respond to the petition and
 prepare for the hearing.  A postponement under this subsection is
 subject to the limits and requirements prescribed by Subsection
 (a-3).
 SECTION 5.  Section 262.203(a), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  On the motion of a party or the court's own motion, if
 applicable, the court that rendered the temporary order shall in
 accordance with procedures provided by Chapter 155:
 (1)  transfer the suit to the court of continuing,
 exclusive jurisdiction, if any, if the court finds that the
 transfer is:
 (A)  necessary for the convenience of the parties;
 and
 (B)  in the best interest of the child;
 (2)  [if grounds exist for mandatory transfer from the
 court of continuing, exclusive jurisdiction under Section
 155.201,] order transfer of the suit from the [that] court of
 continuing, exclusive jurisdiction; or
 (3)  if grounds exist for transfer based on improper
 venue, order transfer of the suit to the court having venue of the
 suit under Chapter 103.
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter C, Chapter 262, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 262.206 to read as follows:
 Sec. 262.206.  EX PARTE HEARINGS PROHIBITED. Unless
 otherwise authorized by this chapter or other law, a hearing held by
 a court in a suit under this chapter may not be ex parte.
 SECTION 7.  Section 263.401, Family Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 263.401.  DISMISSAL AFTER ONE YEAR; NEW TRIALS;
 EXTENSION. (a)  Unless the court has commenced the trial on the
 merits or granted an extension under Subsection (b) or (b-1), on the
 first Monday after the first anniversary of the date the court
 rendered a temporary order appointing the department as temporary
 managing conservator, the court's jurisdiction over [court shall
 dismiss] the suit affecting the parent-child relationship filed by
 the department that requests termination of the parent-child
 relationship or requests that the department be named conservator
 of the child is terminated and the suit is automatically dismissed
 without a court order.
 (b)  Unless the court has commenced the trial on the merits,
 the court may not retain the suit on the court's docket after the
 time described by Subsection (a) unless the court finds that
 extraordinary circumstances necessitate the child remaining in the
 temporary managing conservatorship of the department and that
 continuing the appointment of the department as temporary managing
 conservator is in the best interest of the child. If the court
 makes those findings, the court may retain the suit on the court's
 docket for a period not to exceed 180 days after the time described
 by Subsection (a). If the court retains the suit on the court's
 docket, the court shall render an order in which the court:
 (1)  schedules the new date on which the suit will be
 automatically dismissed if the trial on the merits has not
 commenced, which date must be not later than the 180th day after the
 time described by Subsection (a);
 (2)  makes further temporary orders for the safety and
 welfare of the child as necessary to avoid further delay in
 resolving the suit; and
 (3)  sets the trial on the merits on a date not later
 than the date specified under Subdivision (1).
 (b-1)  If, after commencement of the initial trial on the
 merits within the time required by Subsection (a) or (b), the court
 grants a motion for a new trial or mistrial, or the case is remanded
 to the court by an appellate court following an appeal of the
 court's final order, the court shall retain the suit on the court's
 docket and render an order in which the court:
 (1)  schedules a new date on which the suit will be
 automatically dismissed if the new trial has not commenced, which
 must be a date not later than the 180th day after the date on which:
 (A)  the motion for a new trial or mistrial is
 granted; or
 (B)  the appellate court remanded the case;
 (2)  makes further temporary orders for the safety and
 welfare of the child as necessary to avoid further delay in
 resolving the suit; and
 (3)  sets the new trial on the merits for a date not
 later than the date specified under Subdivision (1).
 (c)  If the court grants an extension under Subsection (b) or
 (b-1) but does not commence the trial on the merits before the
 dismissal date, the court's jurisdiction over [court shall dismiss]
 the suit is terminated and the suit is automatically dismissed
 without a court order. The court may not grant an additional
 extension that extends the suit beyond the required date for
 dismissal under Subsection (b) or (b-1), as applicable.
 (d)  On dismissal of the suit, the clerk shall notify each
 party of the dismissal.
 SECTION 8.  Section 263.402(b), Family Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 9.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a suit affecting the parent-child relationship filed on or after
 the effective date of this Act. A suit affecting the parent-child
 relationship filed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the suit was filed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *