House | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 3384 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3384 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1707 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 617 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 617 | |
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 544 | |
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 544 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |