E | 05/22/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/22/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2574 | |
E | 05/11/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1904 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3385 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1876 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1904 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1791 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3062 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#1049 | Journal Page: 3062 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3062 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3062 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3039 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3039 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2638 | Journal Page: 3039 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2759 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1707 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 544 | |
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 544 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |