Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1443 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Creighton, Schwertner S.B. No. 1443
1+By: Creighton S.B. No. 1443
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 20, 2017, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
4+ May 8, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 3; May 8, 2017,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1443 By: Taylor of Collin
29
310
411 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
512 AN ACT
613 relating to electronic benefits transfer cards used by recipients
714 of benefits under certain assistance programs.
815 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
916 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
1017 amended by adding Section 531.0911 to read as follows:
1118 Sec. 531.0911. PHOTOGRAPH AND OTHER INFORMATION ON CERTAIN
1219 ELECTRONIC BENEFITS TRANSFER CARDS. (a) In this section:
1320 (1) "Financial assistance program" means the
1421 financial assistance program established under Chapter 31, Human
1522 Resources Code.
1623 (2) "Recipient" means a person who receives benefits
1724 under the financial assistance program or the supplemental
1825 nutrition assistance program.
1926 (3) "Supplemental nutrition assistance program" has
2027 the meaning assigned by Section 33.0005, Human Resources Code.
2128 (b) Subject to Subsection (d), the commission shall ensure
2229 that the front side of each electronic benefits transfer card used
2330 by a recipient for purposes of receiving benefits under the
2431 financial assistance program or the supplemental nutrition
2532 assistance program displays:
2633 (1) the name and photograph of the recipient;
2734 (2) the words "Fraud Hotline" followed by the
2835 telephone number of the commission's toll-free hotline for
2936 reporting suspected fraud required under Section 531.108(b)(2);
3037 and
3138 (3) the Internet website address maintained by the
3239 commission for the purpose of allowing persons to report suspected
3340 fraud in either the financial assistance program or the
3441 supplemental nutrition assistance program.
3542 (c) The Department of Public Safety shall provide to the
3643 commission the photograph of a recipient that the department has in
3744 its records for purposes of complying with Subsection (b)(1). The
3845 commission and the department may enter into a memorandum of
3946 understanding for purposes of this subsection.
4047 (d) A recipient is exempt from the photograph requirement
4148 imposed by Subsection (b) if:
4249 (1) the recipient is:
4350 (A) 65 years of age or older;
4451 (B) younger than 19 years of age;
4552 (C) blind;
4653 (D) disabled;
4754 (E) a victim of domestic violence;
4855 (F) homeless; or
4956 (G) issued the electronic benefits transfer card
5057 at a field, regional, or other local commission office; or
5158 (2) the Department of Public Safety does not have a
5259 photograph of the recipient available.
5360 (e) The executive commissioner may adopt rules necessary to
5461 implement this section.
5562 SECTION 2. Section 730.007(c), Transportation Code, is
5663 amended to read as follows:
5764 (c) This section does not:
5865 (1) prohibit the disclosure of a person's photographic
5966 image to:
6067 (A) a law enforcement agency, the Texas
6168 Department of Motor Vehicles, a county tax assessor-collector, or a
6269 criminal justice agency for an official purpose;
6370 (B) an agency of this state investigating an
6471 alleged violation of a state or federal law relating to the
6572 obtaining, selling, or purchasing of a benefit authorized by
6673 Chapter 31 or 33, Human Resources Code; [or]
6774 (C) an agency of this state investigating an
6875 alleged violation of a state or federal law under authority
6976 provided by Title 4, Labor Code; or
7077 (D) the Health and Human Services Commission for
7178 use on an electronic benefits transfer card as required by Section
7279 531.0911, Government Code; or
7380 (2) prevent a court from compelling by subpoena the
7481 production of a person's photographic image.
7582 SECTION 3. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
7683 this section:
7784 (1) notwithstanding Section 531.0911, Government
7885 Code, as added by this Act, the Health and Human Services Commission
7986 is not required to issue electronic benefits transfer cards that
8087 comply with that section until September 1, 2018, but is required to
8188 begin issuing cards that comply with that section beginning on that
8289 date; and
8390 (2) the commission shall ensure that on or before
8491 August 31, 2020, each electronic benefits transfer card used to
8592 deliver benefits to recipients under the financial assistance
8693 program under Chapter 31, Human Resources Code, or the supplemental
8794 nutrition assistance program under Chapter 33, Human Resources
8895 Code, conforms to Section 531.0911, Government Code, as added by
8996 this Act.
9097 (b) The Health and Human Services Commission is required to
9198 implement this Act only if the legislature appropriates money
9299 specifically for that purpose. If the legislature does not
93100 appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the commission
94101 may, but is not required to, implement this Act using other
95102 appropriations available for the purpose.
96103 SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act
97104 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
98105 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
99106 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
100107 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
101108 waiver or authorization is granted.
102109 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
110+ * * * * *