Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1444 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2017

                            S.B. No. 1444


 AN ACT
 relating to de novo hearings in child protection cases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 201.2042, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c) through (g) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The party requesting a de novo hearing before the
 referring court shall file notice with the referring court, [and]
 the clerk of the referring court, and the associate judge.
 (c)  A party may not request a de novo hearing on a default
 judgment or an agreed order.
 (d)  Proceedings under this section shall be given
 precedence over other pending matters to the extent necessary to
 ensure the court reaches a decision promptly.
 (e)  After notice to the parties, the referring court shall
 hold a de novo hearing on an associate judge's proposed final order
 or judgment following a trial on the merits under Subchapter E,
 Chapter 263, and not later than the 45th day after the date the
 initial request for a de novo hearing is filed. Unless the
 referring court has rendered an order disposing of the request for a
 de novo hearing within the period provided by this subsection, the
 request for a de novo hearing is considered denied by the referring
 court.
 (f)  If the referring court has not held a de novo hearing on
 an associate judge's proposed order or judgment on or before the
 30th day after the date the initial request for a de novo hearing is
 filed, a party may file a petition for a writ of mandamus to compel
 the referring court to hold the hearing required by Subsection (e).
 (g)  Except as provided by Section 201.016, the date the
 request for a de novo hearing is considered denied under Subsection
 (e) is the controlling date for the purpose of an appeal to, or a
 request for other relief from, a court of appeals or the supreme
 court.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 201.014(b) and 201.2041(b), Family
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a request for a de novo hearing that is filed on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A request for a de novo hearing filed
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the request was filed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1444 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1444 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor