Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1499 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+85R6676 EES-F
12 By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1499
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 20, 2017, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
4- April 18, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5- Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 18, 2017,
6- sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1499 By: Zaffirini
93
104
115 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
126 AN ACT
137 relating to the regulation of for-profit legal service contract
148 companies.
159 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1610 SECTION 1. Section 953.001(1), Occupations Code, is amended
1711 to read as follows:
1812 (1) "Administrator" means the person responsible for
1913 the administration of a legal service contract. [The term includes
2014 a person responsible for any filing required by this chapter.]
2115 SECTION 2. Section 953.156, Occupations Code, is amended to
2216 read as follows:
2317 Sec. 953.156. FORM OF LEGAL SERVICE CONTRACT AND REQUIRED
2418 DISCLOSURES. [(a) A legal service contract must be filed with the
2519 executive director before it is marketed, sold, offered for sale,
2620 administered, or issued in this state. Any subsequent endorsement
2721 or attachment to the contract must also be filed with the executive
2822 director before the endorsement or attachment is delivered to legal
2923 service contract holders.
3024 [(b)] A legal service contract marketed, sold, offered for
3125 sale, administered, or issued in this state must:
3226 (1) be written, printed, or typed in clear,
3327 understandable language that is easy to read;
3428 (2) include the name and full address of the company;
3529 (3) include the purchase price of the contract and the
3630 terms under which the contract is sold;
3731 (4) include the terms and restrictions governing
3832 cancellation of the contract by the company or the legal service
3933 contract holder;
4034 (5) identify:
4135 (A) any administrator, if the administrator is
4236 not the company;
4337 (B) the sales representative; and
4438 (C) the name of the legal service contract
4539 holder;
4640 (6) include the amount of any deductible or copayment;
4741 (7) specify the legal services and other benefits to
4842 be provided under the contract, and any limitation, exception, or
4943 exclusion;
5044 (8) specify the legal services, if any, for which the
5145 company will provide reimbursement and the amount of that
5246 reimbursement;
5347 (9) specify any restriction governing the
5448 transferability of the contract or the assignment of benefits;
5549 (10) include the duties of the legal service contract
5650 holder;
5751 (11) [include the contact information for the
5852 department, including the department's toll-free number and
5953 electronic mail address, as well as a statement that the department
6054 regulates the company and the company's sales representatives;
6155 [(12)] explain the method to be used in resolving the
6256 legal service contract holder's complaints and grievances;
6357 (12) [(13)] explain how legal services may be obtained
6458 under the legal service contract;
6559 (13) [(14)] include a provision stating that no change
6660 in the contract is valid until the change has been approved by an
6761 executive officer of the company and unless the approval is
6862 endorsed or attached to the contract;
6963 (14) [(15)] include any eligibility and effective
7064 date requirements, including a definition of eligible dependents
7165 and the effective date of their coverage;
7266 (15) [(16)] include the conditions under which
7367 coverage will terminate;
7468 (16) [(17)] explain any subrogation arrangements;
7569 (17) [(18)] contain a payment provision that provides
7670 for a grace period of at least 31 days; and
7771 (18) [(19)] include conditions under which contract
7872 rates may be modified[; and
7973 [(20) include any other items required by the
8074 executive director as determined by rule].
8175 SECTION 3. Section 953.162, Occupations Code, is amended to
8276 read as follows:
8377 Sec. 953.162. APPOINTMENT AND RESPONSIBILITIES OF
8478 ADMINISTRATOR. [(a)] A company may appoint an administrator or
8579 designate a person to be responsible for:
8680 (1) all or any part of the administration or sale of
8781 legal service contracts; and
8882 (2) compliance with this chapter.
8983 [(b) The executive director may adopt rules regarding the
9084 registration of an administrator with the department.]
9185 SECTION 4. Chapter 953, Occupations Code, is amended by
9286 adding Subchapter F to read as follows:
9387 SUBCHAPTER F. ENFORCEMENT
9488 Sec. 953.251. DECEPTIVE TRADE PRACTICE. A violation of
9589 this chapter is a deceptive trade practice actionable under
9690 Subchapter E, Chapter 17, Business & Commerce Code.
9791 SECTION 5. The following provisions of the Occupations Code
9892 are repealed:
9993 (1) Sections 953.001(4), (5), and (6);
10094 (2) Sections 953.004, 953.005, and 953.155; and
10195 (3) Subchapters B, C, and E, Chapter 953.
10296 SECTION 6. (a) On the effective date of this Act, a
10397 registration issued under former Subchapter B, Chapter 953,
10498 Occupations Code, expires.
10599 (b) On the effective date of this Act, a pending proceeding
106100 under Chapter 953, Occupations Code, including a complaint
107101 investigation, disciplinary action, or administrative penalty
108102 proceeding, relating to a registration issued under former
109103 Subchapter B, Chapter 953, Occupations Code, or relating to another
110104 former provision of Chapter 953, Occupations Code, that is repealed
111105 by this Act, is dismissed.
112- SECTION 7. This Act takes effect only if a specific
113- appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a
114- general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature.
115- SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
116- * * * * *
106+ SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.