E | 06/09/2017 | See remarks for effective date | ||
E | 06/09/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4244 | |
E | 05/26/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3699 | |
House | 05/26/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5566 | |
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3317 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3504 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2963 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4606 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Record vote | RV#1721 | Journal Page: 4605 |
House | 05/24/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 4605 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4605 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 4580 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Record vote | RV#1673 | Journal Page: 4473 |
House | 05/23/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4473 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4472 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4004 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 03/14/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 528 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Remarks ordered printed | Journal Page: 474 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 474 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 474 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 474 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffines | Journal Page: 473 |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 484 | |
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 465 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 436 | |
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 395 | |
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 308 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 91 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 91 | |
Senate | 11/22/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/22/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |