Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1510 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Perry S.B. No. 1510
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 20, 2017, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
4+ April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 24, 2017,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1510 By: Campbell
29
310
411 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
512 AN ACT
613 relating to rates charged by certain transmission and distribution
714 utilities to certain places of worship.
815 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
916 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 36, Utilities Code, is
1017 amended by adding Section 36.010 to read as follows:
1118 Sec. 36.010. RATES FOR CERTAIN PLACES OF WORSHIP.
1219 (a) This section only applies to a transmission and distribution
1320 utility that:
1421 (1) on January 1, 2017, operated solely in ERCOT; and
1522 (2) provides service to fewer than 100,000 meters.
1623 (b) A transmission and distribution utility providing
1724 service to a customer that is a nonprofit place of worship shall
1825 bill the customer on a kilowatt hour basis. If the customer has
1926 separately metered facilities, the utility shall bill each of those
2027 facilities on a kilowatt hour basis if the facilities operate
2128 primarily during off-peak periods.
2229 (c) The commission shall adopt rules necessary to
2330 administer this section.
2431 SECTION 2. The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall
2532 adopt rules as necessary to implement Section 36.010, Utilities
2633 Code, as added by this Act, as soon as practicable. A transmission
2734 and distribution utility shall modify its rates applicable to each
2835 nonprofit place of worship in accordance with Section 36.010,
2936 Utilities Code, as added by this Act, not later than January 1,
3037 2018.
3138 SECTION 3. (a) Notwithstanding any other law or agreement,
3239 on the petition of a nonprofit place of worship, the Public Utility
3340 Commission of Texas shall evaluate a charge for transmission or
3441 distribution service charged by a transmission and distribution
3542 utility to the place of worship on or after September 1, 2017, and
3643 before January 1, 2018, to determine whether the charge complies
3744 with Section 36.010, Utilities Code, as added by this Act.
3845 (b) If the Public Utility Commission of Texas determines
3946 under Subsection (a) of this section that the charge does not comply
4047 with Section 36.010, Utilities Code, as added by this Act, the
4148 commission:
4249 (1) by order shall require the utility to refund to the
4350 nonprofit place of worship money collected from the charge in
4451 excess of the charge fixed under Section 36.010, Utilities Code, as
4552 added by this Act; and
4653 (2) may allow the place of worship to recover from the
4754 utility any reasonable expenses incurred by the place of worship in
4855 the process of submitting a petition under this section.
4956 (c) This section expires and a nonprofit place of worship
5057 may not submit a petition under this section after September 1,
5158 2019.
5259 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
60+ * * * * *