Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1559 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2017
Bill May 1, 2017