Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1571 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2017

                            S.B. No. 1571


 AN ACT
 relating to the release of a child taken into possession by a law
 enforcement officer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 2.273 to read as follows:
 Art. 2.273.  RELEASE OF CHILD BY LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER.
 (a)  A law enforcement officer who takes possession of a child
 under Section 262.104, Family Code, may release the child to:
 (1)  a residential child-care facility licensed by the
 Department of Family and Protective Services under Chapter 42,
 Human Resources Code, if the facility is authorized by the
 department to take possession of the child;
 (2)  a juvenile probation department;
 (3)  the Department of Family and Protective Services;
 or
 (4)  any other person authorized by law to take
 possession of the child.
 (b)  Before a law enforcement officer may release a child to
 a person authorized by law to take possession of the child other
 than a governmental entity, the officer shall:
 (1)  verify with the National Crime Information Center
 that the child is not a missing child;
 (2)  search the relevant databases of the National
 Crime Information Center system, including those pertaining to
 protection orders, historical protection orders, warrants, sex
 offender registries, and persons on supervised release to:
 (A)  verify that the person to whom the child is
 being released:
 (i)  does not have a protective order issued
 against the person; and
 (ii)  is not registered as a sex offender
 unless the person is the child's parent or guardian and there are no
 restrictions regarding the person's contact with the child; and
 (B)  obtain any other information the Department
 of Family and Protective Services considers:
 (i)  relevant to protect the welfare of the
 child; or
 (ii)  reflective of the responsibility of
 the person to whom the child is being released;
 (3)  call the Department of Family and Protective
 Services Texas Abuse Hotline to determine whether the person to
 whom the child is being released is listed in the registry as a
 person who abused or neglected a child;
 (4)  verify that the person to whom the child is being
 released is at least 18 years of age; and
 (5)  maintain a record regarding the child's placement,
 including:
 (A)  identifying information about the child,
 including the child's name or pseudonyms; and
 (B)  the name and address of the person to whom the
 child is being released.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1571 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1571 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor