Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB158 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 85R3453 KKR-D
22 By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 158
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to the creation of an open burn pit registry for certain
88 service members and veterans.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as the Service Member and
1111 Veteran Open Burn Pit Registry Act.
1212 SECTION 2. Subtitle D, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
1313 amended by adding Chapter 99 to read as follows:
1414 CHAPTER 99. OPEN BURN PIT REGISTRY
1515 Sec. 99.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1616 (1) "Airborne hazard" means an airborne environmental
1717 contaminant, including open burn pit smoke, oil well fire smoke,
1818 sand, dust, or other particles, that may cause short-term or
1919 long-term health effects to a person exposed to the contaminant.
2020 (2) "Open burn pit," also known as an "open air burn
2121 pit," means a site used for solid waste disposal by burning the
2222 waste in the outdoor air without the use of a commercially
2323 manufactured incinerator or other equipment specifically designed
2424 and manufactured for burning solid waste.
2525 (3) "Service member" means an individual who is
2626 currently serving in:
2727 (A) the armed forces of the United States;
2828 (B) an auxiliary service of one of the armed
2929 forces of the United States, including the National Guard; or
3030 (C) the state military forces as defined by
3131 Section 431.001, Government Code.
3232 (4) "Veteran" means an individual who has served in:
3333 (A) the armed forces of the United States;
3434 (B) an auxiliary service of one of the armed
3535 forces of the United States, including the National Guard; or
3636 (C) the state military forces as defined by
3737 Section 431.001, Government Code.
3838 Sec. 99.002. RULES; MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING. The
3939 executive commissioner shall adopt the rules necessary to
4040 administer this chapter and may enter into a memorandum of
4141 understanding with the United States Department of Veterans Affairs
4242 as necessary to administer this chapter.
4343 Sec. 99.003. OPEN BURN PIT REGISTRY. (a) For outreach,
4444 education, and advocacy related to exposure to open burn pit smoke
4545 or other airborne hazards by service members and veterans in this
4646 state, the department shall create and maintain an open burn pit
4747 registry of service members and veterans who were exposed to open
4848 burn pit smoke or other airborne hazards during their military
4949 service in:
5050 (1) the Southwest Asia theater of operations on or
5151 after August 2, 1990;
5252 (2) Operation Desert Shield or Desert Storm;
5353 (3) Djibouti, Africa, on or after September 11, 2001;
5454 (4) Operation Enduring Freedom, Iraqi Freedom, or New
5555 Dawn; or
5656 (5) any other conflict or theater identified by the
5757 United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
5858 (b) The department shall include for each entry in the open
5959 burn pit registry:
6060 (1) the service member's or veteran's name, address,
6161 phone number, and electronic address;
6262 (2) the location of the service member's or veteran's
6363 service and the period of service;
6464 (3) any medical condition or death of the service
6565 member or veteran that may be related to exposure to open burn pit
6666 smoke or other airborne hazards; and
6767 (4) any other information that the department or the
6868 United States Department of Veterans Affairs considers necessary.
6969 (c) The department shall:
7070 (1) share the information included in the department's
7171 open burn pit registry with the United States Department of
7272 Veterans Affairs Airborne Hazards and Open Burn Pit Registry; and
7373 (2) electronically link the open burn pit registry
7474 created under this chapter with the federal registry.
7575 Sec. 99.004. VOLUNTARY REGISTRATION. A service member or
7676 veteran described by Section 99.003, or a family member of that
7777 service member or veteran, may voluntarily register a case of
7878 exposure to open burn pit smoke or other airborne hazards with the
7979 department for inclusion in the registry.
8080 Sec. 99.005. CONFIDENTIALITY. Entries and information
8181 obtained under this chapter are confidential and are not subject to
8282 disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code, are not subject to
8383 subpoena, and may not otherwise be released or made public except as
8484 provided by this section or Section 99.003.
8585 Sec. 99.006. OPEN BURN PIT INFORMATION. The department,
8686 with the assistance of the Texas Veterans Commission, shall develop
8787 and include on its Internet website information to inform service
8888 members, veterans, and their families about the:
8989 (1) registration and use of the department's open burn
9090 pit registry and the United States Department of Veterans Affairs
9191 Airborne Hazards and Open Burn Pit Registry;
9292 (2) most recent scientific developments on the health
9393 effects of exposure to open burn pit smoke and other airborne
9494 hazards and the status of any illness or condition that is presumed
9595 to be caused by exposure to open burn pit smoke or other airborne
9696 hazards as designated by the United States Department of Veterans
9797 Affairs;
9898 (3) availability of any treatment offered by the
9999 United States Department of Veterans Affairs for an illness or
100100 condition that may be caused by exposure to open burn pit smoke or
101101 other airborne hazards;
102102 (4) process for applying to the United States
103103 Department of Veterans Affairs for service-related disability
104104 compensation for an illness or condition that may be related to
105105 exposure to open burn pit smoke or other airborne hazards,
106106 including the methods for documenting the illness or condition; and
107107 (5) manner of appealing to the United States
108108 Department of Veterans Affairs an existing service-related
109109 disability rating decision or requesting an increased
110110 service-related disability rating based on an illness or condition
111111 that may be related to exposure to open burn pit smoke or other
112112 airborne hazards.
113113 Sec. 99.007. REPORT. Not later than December 1 of each
114114 even-numbered year following the creation of the registry, the
115115 department shall submit a report to the appropriate standing
116116 committees of the house of representatives and senate that
117117 includes:
118118 (1) an assessment of the effectiveness of collection
119119 and maintenance of information on the health effects of exposure to
120120 open burn pit smoke and other airborne hazards; and
121121 (2) any recommendation to improve the collection and
122122 maintenance of information about the health effects of exposure to
123123 open burn pit smoke and other airborne hazards.
124124 SECTION 3. (a) Not later than March 1, 2018, the executive
125125 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
126126 adopt the rules and enter into any memorandum of understanding
127127 necessary to administer this Act.
128128 (b) Notwithstanding Section 99.007, Health and Safety Code,
129129 as added by this Act, not later than December 1, 2018, the
130130 Department of State Health Services shall submit an initial report
131131 under that section.
132132 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.