Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB16 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill November 30, 2016

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill March 27, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill May 11, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2017
Bill March 21, 2017