Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1602 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Campbell, et al. S.B. No. 1602
1+By: Campbell, Perry S.B. No. 1602
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 21, 2017, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
4+ April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 3; April 24, 2017,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1602 By: Kolkhorst
29
310
411 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
512 AN ACT
613 relating to reporting requirements by certain health care
714 facilities for abortion complications; authorizing a civil
815 penalty.
916 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1017 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 171, Health and Safety
1118 Code, is amended by adding Section 171.006 to read as follows:
1219 Sec. 171.006. ABORTION COMPLICATION REPORTING
1320 REQUIREMENTS; CIVIL PENALTY. (a) In this section, "abortion
1421 complication" means any harmful event or adverse outcome with
1522 respect to a patient related to an abortion that is performed on the
1623 patient and that is diagnosed or treated by a health care
1724 practitioner or at a health care facility and includes:
1825 (1) shock;
1926 (2) uterine perforation;
2027 (3) cervical laceration;
2128 (4) hemorrhage;
2229 (5) aspiration or allergic response;
2330 (6) infection;
2431 (7) sepsis;
2532 (8) death of the patient;
2633 (9) incomplete abortion;
2734 (10) damage to the uterus; or
2835 (11) an infant born alive after the abortion.
2936 (b) The reporting requirements of this section apply only to
3037 a health care facility that is a hospital, abortion facility,
3138 freestanding emergency medical care facility, or health care
3239 facility that provides emergency medical care, as defined by
3340 Section 773.003.
3441 (c) Each facility described by Subsection (b) shall submit
3542 to the department in the form and manner prescribed by department
3643 rule a quarterly report on each abortion complication diagnosed or
3744 treated at the facility.
3845 (d) The department shall develop a form for reporting an
3946 abortion complication under Subsection (c) and publish the form on
4047 the department's Internet website. The form must include
4148 appropriate abortion complication diagnosis terminology that is
4249 consistent with standard diagnosis terminology used in medical
4350 practice.
4451 (e) A report under this section may not identify by any
4552 means the physician performing an abortion or the patient.
4653 (f) A report under this section must identify the name and
4754 type of facility submitting the report and must include, if known,
4855 for each abortion complication:
4956 (1) the date of the abortion that caused or may have
5057 caused the complication;
5158 (2) the type of abortion that caused or may have caused
5259 the complication;
5360 (3) the probable post-fertilization age of the unborn
5461 child when the abortion was performed;
5562 (4) the name and type of the facility in which the
5663 abortion was performed;
5764 (5) the date the complication was diagnosed or
5865 treated;
5966 (6) the name and type of any facility other than the
6067 reporting facility in which the complication was diagnosed or
6168 treated;
6269 (7) a description of the complication;
6370 (8) the number of previous live births of the patient;
6471 and
6572 (9) the number of previous induced abortions of the
6673 patient.
6774 (g) Except as provided by Section 245.023, all information
6875 and records held by the department under this section are
6976 confidential and are not open records for the purposes of Chapter
7077 552, Government Code. That information may not be released or made
7178 public on subpoena or otherwise, except that release may be made:
7279 (1) for statistical purposes, but only if a person,
7380 patient, or facility is not identified;
7481 (2) with the consent of each person, patient, and
7582 facility identified in the information released;
7683 (3) to medical personnel, appropriate state agencies,
7784 or county and district courts to enforce this chapter; or
7885 (4) to appropriate state licensing boards to enforce
7986 state licensing laws.
8087 (h) A report submitted under this section must meet the
8188 federal reporting requirements that mandate the most specific,
8289 accurate, and complete coding and reporting for the highest level
8390 of specificity.
8491 (i) The department shall develop and publish on the
8592 department's Internet website an annual report that aggregates on a
8693 statewide basis each abortion complication required to be reported
8794 under Subsection (f) for the previous calendar year.
8895 (j) A facility that violates this section is subject to a
8996 civil penalty of $500 for each violation. The attorney general, at
9097 the request of the department, may file an action to recover a civil
9198 penalty assessed under this subsection and may recover attorney's
9299 fees and costs incurred in bringing the action.
93100 (k) The third separate violation of this section
94101 constitutes cause for the revocation or suspension of a facility's
95102 license, permit, registration, certificate, or other authority or
96103 for other disciplinary action against the facility by the
97104 department.
98105 SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2018:
99106 (1) the Department of State Health Services shall:
100107 (A) develop the reporting forms required by
101108 Section 171.006, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act; and
102109 (B) if duplicate reporting requirements exist
103110 under state law, consolidate the reported information into a single
104111 form; and
105112 (2) the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
106113 Services Commission shall adopt the rules necessary to implement
107114 Section 171.006, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
108115 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
116+ * * * * *