House
|
05/20/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|