Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1631 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/04/2017

                            By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 1631
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 22, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 May 4, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 4, 2017, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1631 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the child safety zone applicable to a person released on
 parole or to mandatory supervision.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 508.187, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b)(1)(B), a requirement
 that a releasee not go in, on, or within a distance specified by a
 parole panel of certain premises does not apply to a releasee while
 the releasee is in or going immediately to or from:
 (1)  a parole office;
 (2)  premises at which the releasee is participating in
 a program or activity required as a condition of release;
 (3)  a residential facility in which the releasee is
 required to reside as a condition of release;
 (4)  a private residence in which the releasee is
 required to reside as a condition of release; or
 (5)  any other premises, facility, or location that is:
 (A)  designed to rehabilitate or reform the
 releasee; or
 (B)  authorized by the division as a premises,
 facility, or location where it is reasonable and necessary for the
 releasee to be present and at which the releasee has legitimate
 business, including a church, synagogue, or other established place
 of religious worship, a workplace, a health care facility, or a
 location of a funeral.
 SECTION 2.  Section 508.225, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a)(2), a requirement that
 an inmate not go in, on, or within a distance specified by a parole
 panel of certain premises does not apply to an inmate while the
 inmate is in or going immediately to or from:
 (1)  a parole office;
 (2)  premises at which the inmate is participating in a
 program or activity required as a condition of release;
 (3)  a residential facility in which the inmate is
 required to reside as a condition of release;
 (4)  a private residence in which the inmate is
 required to reside as a condition of release; or
 (5)  any other premises, facility, or location that is:
 (A)  designed to rehabilitate or reform the
 inmate; or
 (B)  authorized by the division as a premises,
 facility, or location where it is reasonable and necessary for the
 inmate to be present and at which the inmate has legitimate
 business, including a church, synagogue, or other established place
 of religious worship, a workplace, a health care facility, or a
 location of a funeral.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 person on parole or mandatory supervision on or after the effective
 date of this Act, regardless of whether the person was released on
 parole or to mandatory supervision before, on, or after that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *