Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1642 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2017

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1642
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 22, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 24, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1642 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to allowing the holder of a brewpub license to sell beer,
 ale, and malt liquor to certain qualified persons outside the
 state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 74.09(a), Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In addition to the activities authorized by Section
 74.01, the holder of a brewpub license may sell beer produced under
 the license to the holder of a general, local, or branch
 distributor's license or to qualified distributors or other
 similarly situated entities outside the state.
 SECTION 2.  Section 74.10(a), Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In addition to the activities authorized by Section
 74.01, the holder of a brewpub license may sell ale and malt liquor
 to the holder of a wholesaler's permit, a general class B
 wholesaler's permit, or a local class B wholesaler's permit or to
 qualified wholesalers or other similarly situated entities outside
 the state.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *