Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1643 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/20/2017

                            By: Watson S.B. No. 1643
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 22, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 20, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 3; April 20, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1643 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain disclosures of electronic toll collection
 customer account information by a toll project entity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 372, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 372.054 to read as follows:
 Sec. 372.054.  DISCLOSURE OF ELECTRONIC TOLL COLLECTION
 CUSTOMER ACCOUNT INFORMATION TO OTHER TOLL PROJECT ENTITIES.
 (a)  Notwithstanding the confidentiality of electronic toll
 collection customer account information, including confidentiality
 under Sections 228.057(e), 366.179(d), 370.177(m), 370.178(d), and
 372.051(a), a toll project entity with an electronic toll
 collection customer may provide by contract to another toll project
 entity electronic toll collection customer account information,
 including contact and facility use information and trip data, for
 customer service, toll collection, or enforcement purposes.
 (b)  A contract for the provision of electronic toll
 collection customer account information under Subsection (a):
 (1)  must ensure the confidentiality of all account
 information;
 (2)  does not constitute public disclosure for the
 purposes of Chapter 552, Government Code;
 (3)  may not include information related to account
 payment arrangements, including a customer's credit card, debit
 card, charge card, or bank account number; and
 (4)  may not allow for the use of the information for
 commercial purposes.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *