Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1649 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2017

                            S.B. No. 1649


 AN ACT
 relating to increasing the punishment for certain conduct
 constituting the offense of criminal trespass.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 30.05(b), Penal Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (12) to read as follows:
 (12)  "Institution of higher education" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 30.05, Penal Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections (d-1) and (d-2) to
 read as follows:
 (d)  An offense under this section is:
 (1)  a Class B misdemeanor, except as provided by
 Subdivisions (2) and (3);
 (2)  a Class C misdemeanor, except as provided by
 Subdivision (3), if the offense is committed:
 (A)  on agricultural land and within 100 feet of
 the boundary of the land; or
 (B)  on residential land and within 100 feet of a
 protected freshwater area; and
 (3)  a Class A misdemeanor if:
 (A)  the offense is committed:
 (i)  in a habitation or a shelter center;
 (ii)  on a Superfund site; or
 (iii)  on or in a critical infrastructure
 facility; [or]
 (B)  the offense is committed on or in property of
 an institution of higher education and it is shown on the trial of
 the offense that the person has previously been convicted of:
 (i)  an offense under this section relating
 to entering or remaining on or in property of an institution of
 higher education; or
 (ii)  an offense under Section 51.204(b)(1),
 Education Code, relating to trespassing on the grounds of an
 institution of higher education; or
 (C)  the person carries a deadly weapon during the
 commission of the offense.
 (d-1)  For the purposes of Subsection (d)(3)(B), a person has
 previously been convicted of an offense described by that paragraph
 if the person was adjudged guilty of the offense or entered a plea
 of guilty or nolo contendere in return for a grant of deferred
 adjudication community supervision, regardless of whether the
 sentence for the offense was ever imposed or whether the sentence
 was probated and the person was subsequently discharged from
 deferred adjudication community supervision.
 (d-2)  At the punishment stage of a trial in which the
 attorney representing the state seeks the increase in punishment
 provided by Subsection (d)(3)(B), the defendant may raise the issue
 as to whether, at the time of the instant offense or the previous
 offense, the defendant was engaging in speech or expressive conduct
 protected by the First Amendment to the United States Constitution
 or Section 8, Article I, Texas Constitution.  If the defendant
 proves the issue in the affirmative by a preponderance of the
 evidence, the increase in punishment provided by Subsection
 (d)(3)(B) does not apply.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.  For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1649 passed the Senate on
 May 10, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays 5; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 25, Nays 6.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1649 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 105,
 Nays 40, three present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor