Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1667 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/12/2017

                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 1667
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 22, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 12, 2017, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; April 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1667 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the nature, funding, and functions of the Texas
 Low-Level Radioactive Waste Compact Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 403.005, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.005.  POWERS AND DUTIES.  (a)  The Texas Low-Level
 Radioactive Waste Disposal Compact Commission and the members of
 the commission have the powers and duties prescribed by the
 compact. The members of the commission are responsible for
 administering the provisions of the compact.
 (b)  The commission may conduct other activities not
 described by the federal law governing the commission or the
 compact, as long as those activities are consistent with the
 policies and procedures of this state.
 SECTION 2.  Section 403.0051, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.0051.  COMMISSION AS INDEPENDENT ENTITY; FUNDING.
 (a)  The commission is an independent entity established by federal
 law and governed by the compact and is not an agency of this state or
 a program, department, or other division of, or administratively
 attached to, an agency of this state [the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality].
 (b)  The legislature may appropriate money to the
 commission.  Money for the commission may not be appropriated as
 part of an appropriation for the Texas Commission on Environmental
 Quality.
 (c)  The comptroller may:
 (1)  assign the commission an agency code; and
 (2)  from funds appropriated to the commission, provide
 for the reimbursement of a commission member or employee or a person
 who contracts with the commission for purchases approved by the
 commission, including state and local sales tax.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *