Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1680 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/09/2017

                    85R6412 DMS-F
 By: Lucio S.B. No. 1680


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a task force of border health officials.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle F, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 120 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 120. TASK FORCE OF BORDER HEALTH OFFICIALS
 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 120.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Border region" means the Texas-Mexico border
 region, as defined by Section 2056.002, Government Code.
 (2)  "Task force" means the Task Force of Border Health
 Officials.
 SUBCHAPTER B. POWERS AND DUTIES
 Sec. 120.051.  TASK FORCE; DUTIES. (a)  The department shall
 establish the Task Force of Border Health Officials to advise the
 commissioner:
 (1)  on policy priorities addressing major issues
 affecting the border region residents' health and health
 conditions;
 (2)  on raising public awareness of the issues
 described by Subdivision (1); and
 (3)  on other health issues impacting the border region
 as determined by the commissioner, including:
 (A)  barriers to accessing health care;
 (B)  health problems affecting the region,
 including:
 (i)  diabetes;
 (ii)  infant mortality;
 (iii)  heart disease and stroke;
 (iv)  obesity;
 (v)  cervical cancer; and
 (vi)  communicable diseases, including
 tuberculosis;
 (C)  factors that impede access to health care,
 including:
 (i)  socioeconomic conditions;
 (ii)  linguistic and cultural barriers;
 (iii)  low population density; and
 (iv)  lack of health insurance;
 (D)  providing increased surveillance and
 tracking of communicable diseases, environmental factors, and
 other factors negatively influencing health;
 (E)  standardization of data to ensure
 compatibility with data being collected by border states on both
 sides of the Mexican border;
 (F)  public health infrastructure, including
 education and research institutions that can train culturally
 competent health care providers;
 (G)  establishing local and regional public
 health programs that build on local resources and maximize the use
 of public dollars to address the needs of the indigent population;
 and
 (H)  improving collaboration and cooperation with
 Mexican counterparts of the task force at the state and federal
 level, and collaboration with federal counterparts in the United
 States.
 (b)  The task force shall study and make recommendations
 relating to the health problems, conditions, challenges, and needs
 of the population in the border region.
 (c)  The task force shall submit a report of recommendations
 to the commissioner for short-term and long-term border plans, as
 described by Subchapter C, not later than November 1 of each
 even-numbered year.
 Sec. 120.052.  COLLABORATION WITH THE OFFICE OF BORDER
 HEALTH. The Office of Border Health established under Section
 12.071 shall provide staff support to the task force and any other
 assistance as needed or required by the task force, if practicable.
 Sec. 120.053.  COMPOSITION. (a)  The task force is composed
 of:
 (1)  the health department directors appointed under
 Section 121.033 from:
 (A)  each county in the border region; and
 (B)  each municipality in the border region that
 has a sister city in Mexico;
 (2)  two ex officio nonvoting members who are members
 of the legislature:
 (A)  one of whom is appointed by the lieutenant
 governor; and
 (B)  one of whom is appointed by the speaker of the
 house of representatives; and
 (3)  additional members appointed by the commissioner.
 (b)  The commissioner shall designate a chair and vice chair
 of the task force from among the task force members.
 (c)  The members appointed by the lieutenant governor and the
 speaker of the house of representatives serve three-year terms.
 Sec. 120.054.  MEETINGS. (a)  The task force shall meet at
 least quarterly each fiscal year. Members may hold meetings by
 conference calls and through videoconference in accordance with
 Section 551.127, Government Code.
 (b)  Section 551.125, Government Code, applies to a meeting
 held by conference call under this section, except that Section
 551.125(b), Government Code, does not apply.
 Sec. 120.055.  COMPENSATION. A task force member is not
 entitled to compensation or reimbursement for expenses incurred in
 performing the member's duties.
 SUBCHAPTER C. BORDER HEALTH IMPROVEMENT PLAN
 Sec. 120.101.  SHORT-TERM AND LONG-TERM PLANS. (a)  The task
 force shall make recommendations to the commissioner for short-term
 and long-term border health improvement plans. The short-term plan
 shall identify health objectives proposed to be accomplished before
 the fourth anniversary of the date the plan is adopted.  The
 long-term plan shall identify health objectives proposed to be
 accomplished before the ninth anniversary of the date the plan is
 adopted.
 (b)  The commissioner shall review the task force's
 recommendations and, based on those recommendations, recommend
 short-term and long-term border health improvement plans to the
 executive commissioner, identifying specific health objectives
 that may be implemented under existing law.
 (c)  The executive commissioner shall adopt short-term and
 long-term border health improvement plans and direct the department
 to implement the portions of the plans that can be implemented
 within existing appropriations under existing law.
 (d)  Not later than September 1 of each even-numbered year,
 the executive commissioner shall submit a report detailing the
 actions taken by the task force. The report must include:
 (1)  the status of all projects and activities
 involving the health issues described under Section 120.051(a)(3);
 (2)  the funding for the expenditures; and
 (3)  recommendations for legislation necessary to
 implement the short-term and long-term border health improvement
 plans.
 Sec. 120.102.  APPLICATION OF OTHER LAW. Chapter 2110,
 Government Code, does not apply to the task force.
 Sec. 120.103.  ASSISTANCE FROM STATE AGENCIES AND POLITICAL
 SUBDIVISIONS. At the request of the task force, a state agency or
 political subdivision of this state shall cooperate with the task
 force to the greatest extent practicable to fully implement the
 task force's statutory duties.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The commissioner of state health services,
 lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives
 shall appoint the members of the Task Force of Border Health
 Officials established by this Act not later than October 1, 2017.
 (b)  The initial short-term border health improvement plan
 adopted under Section 120.101, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act, must include a border health improvement plan for
 implementation beginning not later than September 1, 2018. The
 Department of State Health Services shall implement the initiatives
 in the short-term border health improvement plan, as directed by
 the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services
 Commission, not later than September 1, 2022.
 (c)  The initial long-term border health improvement plan
 adopted under Section 120.101, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act, must include a border health improvement plan for
 implementation beginning not later than September 1, 2020. The
 Department of State Health Services shall implement the initiatives
 in the long-term border health improvement plan, as directed by the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission,
 not later than September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.