Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1680 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2017
Bill April 27, 2017