Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1680 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2017

                    By: Lucio, et al. S.B. No. 1680
 (Raymond)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a task force of border health officials.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle F, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 120 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 120.  TASK FORCE OF BORDER HEALTH OFFICIALS
 SUBCHAPTER A.  GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 120.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Border region" means the area consisting of the
 counties immediately adjacent to the international boundary
 between the United States and Mexico.
 (2)  "Task force" means the Task Force of Border Health
 Officials.
 Sec. 120.002.  SUNSET PROVISION. The task force is subject
 to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless
 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the task force
 is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2029.
 SUBCHAPTER B.  POWERS AND DUTIES
 Sec. 120.051.  TASK FORCE; DUTIES. (a)  The department
 shall establish the Task Force of Border Health Officials to advise
 the commissioner:
 (1)  on policy priorities addressing major issues
 affecting the border region residents' health and health
 conditions;
 (2)  on raising public awareness of the issues
 described by Subdivision (1); and
 (3)  on other health issues impacting the border region
 as determined by the commissioner, including:
 (A)  barriers to accessing health care;
 (B)  health problems affecting the region,
 including:
 (i)  diabetes;
 (ii)  infant mortality;
 (iii)  heart disease and stroke;
 (iv)  obesity;
 (v)  cervical cancer; and
 (vi)  communicable diseases, including
 tuberculosis;
 (C)  factors that impede access to health care,
 including:
 (i)  socioeconomic conditions;
 (ii)  linguistic and cultural barriers;
 (iii)  low population density; and
 (iv)  lack of health insurance;
 (D)  surveillance and tracking of communicable
 diseases, environmental factors, and other factors negatively
 influencing health;
 (E)  standardization of data to ensure
 compatibility with data collected by border states on both sides of
 the international border with Mexico;
 (F)  public health infrastructure that includes
 education and research institutions to train culturally competent
 health care providers;
 (G)  establishment of local and regional public
 health programs that build on local resources and maximize the use
 of public dollars to address the needs of the indigent population;
 and
 (H)  collaboration and cooperation with Mexican
 counterparts of the task force at the state and federal level, and
 collaboration with federal counterparts in the United States.
 (b)  The task force shall study and make recommendations
 relating to the health problems, conditions, challenges, and needs
 of the population in the border region.
 (c)  The task force shall submit a report of recommendations
 to the commissioner for short-term and long-term border plans, as
 described by Subchapter C, not later than November 1 of each
 even-numbered year.
 Sec. 120.052.  COLLABORATION WITH OFFICE OF BORDER HEALTH.
 The Office of Border Health established under Section 12.071 shall
 provide staff support to the task force and any other assistance as
 needed or required by the task force, if practicable.
 Sec. 120.053.  COMPOSITION; TERMS. (a)  The task force is
 composed of:
 (1)  the health department directors appointed under
 Section 121.033 from:
 (A)  each county in the border region; and
 (B)  each municipality in the border region that
 has a sister city in Mexico;
 (2)  two ex officio nonvoting members who are members
 of the legislature:
 (A)  one of whom is appointed by the lieutenant
 governor; and
 (B)  one of whom is appointed by the speaker of the
 house of representatives; and
 (3)  additional members appointed by the commissioner.
 (b)  The commissioner shall designate a chair and vice chair
 of the task force from among the task force members.
 (c)  The members appointed by the lieutenant governor and the
 speaker of the house of representatives serve three-year terms.
 Sec. 120.054.  MEETINGS. (a)  The task force shall meet at
 least quarterly each fiscal year. Members may hold meetings by
 conference calls and through videoconference in accordance with
 Section 551.127, Government Code.
 (b)  Section 551.125, Government Code, applies to a meeting
 held by conference call under this section, except that Section
 551.125(b), Government Code, does not apply.
 Sec. 120.055.  COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT. A task force
 member is not entitled to compensation or reimbursement for
 expenses incurred in performing the member's duties.
 SUBCHAPTER C.  BORDER HEALTH IMPROVEMENT PLAN
 Sec. 120.101.  SHORT-TERM AND LONG-TERM PLANS. (a)  The
 task force shall make recommendations to the commissioner for
 short-term and long-term border health improvement plans. The
 short-term plan shall identify health objectives proposed to be
 accomplished before the fourth anniversary of the date the plan is
 adopted.  The long-term plan shall identify health objectives
 proposed to be accomplished before the ninth anniversary of the
 date the plan is adopted.
 (b)  The commissioner shall review the task force's
 recommendations and, based on those recommendations, recommend
 short-term and long-term border health improvement plans to the
 executive commissioner, identifying specific health objectives
 that may be implemented under existing law.
 (c)  The executive commissioner shall adopt short-term and
 long-term border health improvement plans and direct the department
 to implement the portions of the plans that may be implemented
 within existing appropriations under existing law.
 (d)  Not later than September 1 of each even-numbered year,
 the executive commissioner shall submit a report detailing the
 actions taken by the task force. The report must include:
 (1)  the status of all projects and activities
 involving the health issues described under Section 120.051(a)(3);
 (2)  the funding for the expenditures; and
 (3)  recommendations for legislation necessary to
 implement the short-term and long-term border health improvement
 plans.
 Sec. 120.102.  APPLICATION OF OTHER LAW.  Chapter 2110,
 Government Code, does not apply to the task force.
 Sec. 120.103.  ASSISTANCE FROM STATE AGENCIES AND POLITICAL
 SUBDIVISIONS. At the request of the task force, a state agency or
 political subdivision of this state may cooperate with the task
 force to the greatest extent practicable to fully implement the
 task force's statutory duties.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The commissioner of state health services,
 lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives
 shall appoint the members of the Task Force of Border Health
 Officials established by this Act not later than October 1, 2017.
 (b)  The initial short-term border health improvement plan
 adopted under Section 120.101, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act, must include a border health improvement plan for
 implementation beginning not later than September 1, 2018. The
 Department of State Health Services shall implement the initiatives
 in the short-term border health improvement plan, as directed by
 the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services
 Commission, not later than September 1, 2022.
 (c)  The initial long-term border health improvement plan
 adopted under Section 120.101, Health and Safety Code, as added by
 this Act, must include a border health improvement plan for
 implementation beginning not later than September 1, 2020. The
 Department of State Health Services shall implement the initiatives
 in the long-term border health improvement plan, as directed by the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission,
 not later than September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.