Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1683 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Lucio S.B. No. 1683
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 22, 2017, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
4+ May 4, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
5+ Nays 4; May 4, 2017, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
49 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
510 AN ACT
611 relating to food allergen awareness in food service establishments.
712 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
813 SECTION 1. Chapter 437, Health and Safety Code, is amended
914 by adding Section 437.024 to read as follows:
1015 Sec. 437.024. FOOD ALLERGEN AWARENESS. (a) A food service
1116 establishment shall display a poster relating to food allergen
1217 awareness in an area of the establishment accessible primarily to
1318 employees of the establishment. The department shall determine the
1419 form and content of the poster and post a sample poster on the
1520 department's Internet website.
1621 (b) A food service establishment may display the
1722 information from the sample poster in lieu of the poster, provided
1823 that the information is presented and posted in a manner that is
1924 easily readable by the establishment's employees in the selected
2025 employee area.
2126 (c) The poster or posted information must include
2227 information regarding:
2328 (1) the risk of an allergic reaction;
2429 (2) the eight major food allergens, including milk,
2530 wheat, eggs, soy, shellfish, peanuts, tree nuts, and fish; and
2631 (3) methods for preventing cross-contamination in
2732 food preparation.
2833 (d) The executive commissioner shall adopt rules necessary
2934 to implement this section.
3035 (e) This section does not create a private cause of action
3136 or change any common law or statutory duty.
3237 SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2017:
3338 (1) the Department of State Health Services shall
3439 determine the form and content of the poster and post the sample
3540 poster on the department's Internet website as required by Section
3641 437.024, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act; and
3742 (2) the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
3843 Services Commission shall adopt any rules necessary to implement
3944 Section 437.024, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
4045 SECTION 3. Notwithstanding Section 437.024, Health and
4146 Safety Code, as added by this Act, a food service establishment is
4247 not required to comply with that section before January 1, 2018.
4348 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
49+ * * * * *