Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|