Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1710 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2017

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2017
Bill April 11, 2017